This transcription has been completed. Contact us with corrections.
38 Head Quarters Bureau R.F. and A.L State of Texas. Galveston Texas March 8th 1866- Special Orders. } No 48. } Extract. I. A. M. Sperry Esqr is hereby Appointed a Special Agent of this Bureau he will act as Inspector of the financial affairs of the Freedmen of this state, and will take possession of all Abandoned Lands and Tenements in the State, The Sub Asst. Commissioners are requested to render him all the assistance he may need in discovering frauds upon the Freedmen, and in gathering information which he can report to the Asst. Comr as to how their monied interests can best be secured to them By Com.d of Brig Genl E. M. Gregory Wm H. Sinclair A.A. Genl 39 Head Quarters, Bureau R. F. and A. L, State of Texas Galveston March 10th 1866 Special Orders} No 49.} Extract, I. The resignation of Lieut. O. H. Swingley 12th Ills V. Cavalry having been accepted he is therefor relieved from duty in this Bureau as Sub. Asst. Commissioner at Austin, Texas, and will turn over all Books, Orders, Records or other property belonging to this Bureau to Capt Albert Evans 116th U.S. C.T. II. Captain Albert Evans 116th U.S. C.T. having reported for duty all these Head Quarters in pursuance of S. O. No 30, Headquarters Dept. of the Texas dated Galveston Texas, February 7th, 1866 is hereby assigned to duty as a Sub. Asst. Com'r of this Bureau and will proceed to Austin, Texas and relieve Lieut O. H. Swingley 12th ills. V.V. Cavalry. The Q. M. Dept will furnish the necessary transportation. By Com.d of Brig Genl E. M. Gregory Wm N Sinclair A. A. Genl
Transcription Notes:
----------
Reopened for Editing 2023-04-18 10:15:13